for squares use this formula (a square+2ab+b square), for every 2 digit no. starting from right end
here is one ex. let 87 a=8, b=7 , then starts form right end so b squares is 49 , last digit is 9 from right end and 2ab =112 so from above we have 4 so,112+4=116, so next digit is 6, and next is a square =64 , so from above we have have 11 so add it 64+11=75, so ans is 7569 is the ans

Short tricks for Square of 2 digit no. which is ends in 5. For Example 35 is the number you want to square. Multiply the first digit of number with the next to its number. i.e 3*4 is equal to 12. finally add 25 at the end of result. Answer:- 1225

Right now my concentration is on UIIC-Generalist officer preparation.
Is it possible to get materials about Finance in objective exam point of view.
Looking forth your valuable reply at the earliest.

hi sir,
please tell the shortcut of 459*984.i prepare a bank exam.please reply the shortcut to my email.how to correct the errors part in english.please reply the way

Sir this is Srinivas preparing for the IBPS. please send me the short cut for the numbers which are in the decimal form (both multiplication and division)

aiswarya says

thnx a lot for providing wonderful tricks

jhun says

more shortcuts please?tnx for the help..

jhun says

tnx

Nitin Bansal says

sir i am prepairing for bank exam. please send me important sort trick to my email.

please-please.

sirisha says

please tell me he how to findout the put zero after or before the given number

srinu0715 says

Hi, you have to put zero after the given number and then subtract original number from this new number so that you will get result.

Here is the example:

587*9?

Put zero after 587 then you will get 5870 ad then subtract 587 from 5870.

The result is 5283.

haripriya says

very useful shortcuts.

ashritha says

These shortcuts r very useful.i want 2 know more shortcuts which will b beneficial in exams so pls kindly update shortcuts to my mail

m sreenivasul says

hi i want multiplicaion tricks for bank exams

m sreenivasul says

i want bank exams shortcurts for simplifications in quantative……………

m sreenivasul says

BANK EXAM TRICS FOR QUANTATIVE…….

anurag bhargava says

what will be the multiplication of 14478*83

Vani says

I want more shortcuts for maths plz send my mail

nagaraju says

for squares use this formula (a square+2ab+b square), for every 2 digit no. starting from right end

here is one ex. let 87 a=8, b=7 , then starts form right end so b squares is 49 , last digit is 9 from right end and 2ab =112 so from above we have 4 so,112+4=116, so next digit is 6, and next is a square =64 , so from above we have have 11 so add it 64+11=75, so ans is 7569 is the ans

stupid402 says

Very nice one thx….waiting for the next shortcut

poonam says

pl tell me square for every 3 digit number.

arun says

Squre of 87

Squre of 7=49 put 9 @ right end

Then 8*87+8*7+4=756

Now write it together 7569

nagaraju says

175 x 175 = (170 x 180) + (5 x 5)

= 30,625

275 x 275 = (270 x 280) + (5 x 5)

= 75,625, and u know how to mul 2 digit no. with 2 digit no.

uday kiran says

pls send more shortcuts to my email

Anchal says

thanx for math tricks

MANORANJAN KARAN says

I Will teach u Multiplication of 5 with any no.-

Let 8798*5=?

First Multiply with 8798 by 10 = 87980, then divide it by 2 =”43990″ this is the result.

So you can multiply any no with 5 by following this rule.

poonam says

Short tricks for Square of 2 digit no. which is ends in 5. For Example 35 is the number you want to square. Multiply the first digit of number with the next to its number. i.e 3*4 is equal to 12. finally add 25 at the end of result. Answer:- 1225

sri says

I WANT MORE TRICKS FOR QUANTITATIVE PLZ MAIL TO ME……….

BALASAHEB DHAKNE says

plz tell shotcut method of mulyiplicayion

prashant says

HELLO SIR…

PLS TELL ME THE SHORT TRICKS OF COMBINATION SELECTION qUESTION,AND c.I & s.I

tHANKS

@shok says

Thank you these short tricks really help for sbi exam prep. plz kindly send more trick update on my mail.

sonam says

plz send me important tricks for SBI PO along with some useful books

anu says

hi sir, please tell me shortcut method for 3 (or) more digits multiplications

eg:- 346*648

Preethi says

Hi Sir,

Can you pls send me the tricks for solving data interpretation for po exam within time to my mail id preethiaug31@gmail.com

Arun Chaturvedi says

Please tell me 8427*19

Admin says

8427*2 = 16854

Now put a zero at the end to make it 168540

Subtract 168540

– 8427

__________

161013

TULSI KUMARI says

Hello sir,

Very goodevening!

can tou send me some more tricks,,on that

nitish says

hello sir.. how to solve it by a shirtcut method….(755% of 523)/777=?

Arwind Goandwal says

Hello Friends , I am prepairing my bank exam first time ,Please send me sort trick.

ritu awasthi says

sir,i m preparation 4r bank or ssc exam so plz kindly tel me how i can solve square of 3 digits number,plz give me some short tricks.

Prraveena says

Hai Mentor,

Right now my concentration is on UIIC-Generalist officer preparation.

Is it possible to get materials about Finance in objective exam point of view.

Looking forth your valuable reply at the earliest.

Jai Bhagwan says

HCF and LCM ka short method kya hoga sir/madam please tell me

aditya says

plz send me some short cuts methord

NAVYA says

PLZ SEND ME THE TRICKS

rajsree says

33*45 how to calculate in short cut

method

rajsree says

plz reply sir

rajsree says

sry sir i got ansr as ur method

its very useful to us

thanku

danish arbi says

sir who ever you are but you are great. really i m crazy to know more about the short method of counting and like more……pls pls send my on email

Danish Arbi

danisharbi@yahoo.com

meenakshi says

plz send me short trick for square,multiplation,divide,data surffng,seating,direction

Sourav says

U r genius

N Nagendra Babu says

plz send me some tricks and shortcuts for GENERAL ENGLISH, REASONING, AND QUANTITATIVE APPTITUDE my mail is nagendrababu.215@gmail.com

suchitra says

Please send me all the shortcut tricks for bank exams.

Thanks and Regards.

prudhvi says

please send me the qa shortcuts(all topics)

Vijaya says

Hi Mohan,

Ur tips are very usefully, Pls. send some more multiplication short cuts to my mail ID

Thanks in Advance

yashoda says

sir i am prepairing for bank exam. please send me important sort trick to my email.

please-please.

jeyasri says

hi sir,

please tell the shortcut of 459*984.i prepare a bank exam.please reply the shortcut to my email.how to correct the errors part in english.please reply the way

nagamani says

plz send short cuts for quantitative aptituted

nagamani says

plz send shortcuts for quantitative aptitude all topics

LAKSHMAN KUMAR says

good

Srinivas says

Sir this is Srinivas preparing for the IBPS. please send me the short cut for the numbers which are in the decimal form (both multiplication and division)

prashant says

please send me simplification short tricks.